Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED in concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
READ ONCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 686 Yeas 22 - Nays 13 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Taken from the table by the President
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Unfinished Business
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
On motion by Senator HICKMAN of Kennebec TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass Report in Concurrence. Roll Call Ordered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass Report in Concurrence.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Reports READ
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
The Bill was READ ONCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
ROLL CALL NO. 468 (Yeas 81 - Nays 63 - Absent 6 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1)
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
On motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Reports READ.
|
|
|
Joint
|
04/03/2024
|
Reported Out: OTP/OTP-AM
|
|
|
Joint
|
03/11/2024
|
Voted: Divided Report
|
|
|
Joint
|
03/11/2024
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
On motion by Senator Carney of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on Judiciary and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218, in concurrence.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Report was READ and ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Representative MOONEN for the Joint Standing Committee on Judiciary pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 1, section 411, subsection 6, paragraph G reports that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY and printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218.
|
|
|