Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-674).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (S-674) was READ and ADOPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
The Bill was READ ONCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
On motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Reports READ.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-674)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (S-674) READ and ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
READ ONCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Reports READ
|
|
|
Joint
|
04/09/2024
|
Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP
|
|
|
Joint
|
03/28/2024
|
Voted: Divided Report
|
|
|
Joint
|
03/28/2024
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
Joint
|
03/25/2024
|
Work Session Held: TABLED
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Report was READ and ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
On motion by Senator Carney of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on Judiciary and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Report READ and ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Reported by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland for the Joint Standing Committee on Judiciary pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 4, section 1804, subsection 3.
|
|
|