House
|
05/10/2024
|
Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-631) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-783) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (S-631) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-783) thereto ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-783) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-631) READ and ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Under further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (S-631) was ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-631)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
On Motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
FINALLY PASSED.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-631).
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-631).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (S-631) READ and ADOPTED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
READ ONCE.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Report READ and ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
Joint
|
04/01/2024
|
Reported Out: OTP-AM
|
|
|
Joint
|
03/14/2024
|
Voted: OTP-AM
|
|
|
Joint
|
03/14/2024
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
|
|
|