Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Ordered sent down forthwith.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-939), in concurrence.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-939) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
READ ONCE.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-939).
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
|
|
|
Joint
|
04/09/2024
|
Reported Out: OTP-AM
|
|
|
Joint
|
03/19/2024
|
Voted: OTP-AM
|
|
|
Joint
|
03/19/2024
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
Joint
|
03/14/2024
|
Work Session Held: TABLED
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION in concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Report was READ and ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Representative PERRY for the Joint Standing Committee on Taxation pursuant to Public Law 2023, chapter 358, section 2, subsection 7 reports that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION and printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218.
|
|
|