Senate | 05/10/2024 | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2024 | On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. | ||
House | 04/10/2024 | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | ||
House | 04/10/2024 | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | ||
House | 04/09/2024 | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-657). | ||
House | 04/09/2024 | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | ||
House | 04/09/2024 | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | ||
House | 04/09/2024 | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-657). | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Committee Amendment "A" (S-657) READ and ADOPTED. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | READ ONCE. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Report READ and ACCEPTED. | ||
Joint | 04/03/2024 | Reported Out: OTP-AM | ||
Joint | 03/28/2024 | Voted: OTP-AM | ||
Joint | 03/28/2024 | Work Session Held | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2024 | Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |