Senate
|
07/06/2023
|
Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 484 Yeas 22 - Nays 9 - Excused 4 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2023
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
07/06/2023
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2023
|
Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-717) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-721) AND House Amendment "B" (H-722) thereto in concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2023
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-717) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-721) AND House Amendment "B" (H-722) thereto ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2023
|
House Amendment "B" (H-722) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-717) READ and ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2023
|
House Amendment "A" (H-721) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-717) READ and ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2023
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-717) READ
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2023
|
READ ONCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2023
|
Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 478 Yeas 22 - Nays 9 - Excused 4 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2023
|
On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2023
|
Reports Read
|
|
|
House
|
07/06/2023
|
The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-717) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-721) and House Amendment "B" (H-722) thereto.
|
|
|
House
|
07/06/2023
|
Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
07/06/2023
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-717) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-721) and House Amendment "B" (H-722) thereto was ADOPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
07/06/2023
|
On motion of Representative SACHS of Freeport, House Amendment "B" (H-722) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-717) was READ and ADOPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
07/06/2023
|
On motion of Representative SACHS of Freeport, House Amendment "A" (H-721) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-717) was READ and ADOPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
07/06/2023
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-717) was READ.
|
|
|
House
|
07/06/2023
|
The Bill was READ ONCE.
|
|
|
House
|
07/06/2023
|
ROLL CALL NO. 350 (Yeas 80 - Nays 58 - Absent 13 - Excused 0)
|
|
|
House
|
07/06/2023
|
On motion of Representative SACHS of Freeport, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
07/06/2023
|
Reports READ.
|
|
|
House
|
07/06/2023
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
Joint
|
07/05/2023
|
Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP
|
|
|
Joint
|
06/28/2023
|
Voted: Divided Report
|
|
|
Joint
|
06/24/2023
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
Joint
|
06/20/2023
|
Work Session Held: TABLED
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS in concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2023
|
Committee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs suggested and ordered printed.
|
|
|