Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Ordered sent down forthwith.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-59), in concurrence.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-59) READ and ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
READ ONCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-59).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
|
|
|
Joint
|
04/21/2023
|
Reported Out: OTP-AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594.
|
|
|
Joint
|
03/15/2023
|
Voted: OTP-AM
|
|
|
Joint
|
03/15/2023
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
Joint
|
03/09/2023
|
Work Session Held: TABLED
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION in concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2023
|
Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed.
|
|
|