Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 761 Yeas 27 - Nays 6 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-709) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-717) thereto.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (S-709) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-717) thereto was ADOPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Senate Amendment "A" (S-717) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-709) was READ and ADOPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (S-709) was READ.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
The Bill was READ ONCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
ROLL CALL NO. 538 (Yeas 96 - Nays 47 - Absent 7 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
On motion of Representative SUPICA of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Reports READ.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-709) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-717) thereto
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (S-709) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-717) thereto ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 748 Yeas 31 - Nays 2 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
On motion by Senator HICKMAN of Kennebec Senate Amendment "A" (S-717) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-709) READ and ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (S-709) READ
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
READ ONCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 747 Yeas 26 - Nays 6 - Excused 3 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Taken from the table by the President
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Unfinished Business
|
|
|
Joint
|
04/15/2024
|
Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
On further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report,
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Senator HICKMAN of Kennebec moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Reports READ
|
|
|
Joint
|
03/20/2024
|
Voted: Divided Report
|
|
|
Joint
|
03/20/2024
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
Joint
|
03/18/2024
|
Work Session Held: TABLED
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/26/2023
|
CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847.
|
|
|
Joint
|
07/25/2023
|
Carry Over Approved
|
|
|
Joint
|
06/01/2023
|
Carry Over Requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594.
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2023
|
Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
|
|
|