House | 04/11/2023 | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | On motion of Representative PLUECKER of Warren, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Reports READ. | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Sent down for concurrence | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | On motion by Senator INGWERSEN of York The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Reports READ | ||
Joint | 04/04/2023 | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. | ||
Joint | 03/22/2023 | Voted: Divided Report | ||
Joint | 03/22/2023 | Work Session Held | ||
House | 02/02/2023 | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |