Senate
|
07/25/2023
|
FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
07/25/2023
|
ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
House
|
07/25/2023
|
The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-63) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-453) thereto.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/25/2023
|
Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/25/2023
|
PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-63) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-453) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/25/2023
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-63) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-453) thereto ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/25/2023
|
On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-453) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-63) READ and ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/25/2023
|
Under further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-63) was ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/25/2023
|
Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-63)
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/25/2023
|
On Motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
|
|
|
House
|
07/25/2023
|
FINALLY PASSED.
|
|
|
House
|
07/25/2023
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Ordered sent down forthwith.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-63), in concurrence.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-63) READ and ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
READ ONCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 112 Yeas 22 - Nays 11 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
On motion by Senator RAFFERTY of York the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Reports Read
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-63).
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-63) was READ and ADOPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
The Resolve was READ ONCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
ROLL CALL NO. 44 (Yeas 81 - Nays 61 - Absent 8 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
On motion of Representative BRENNAN of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Reports READ.
|
|
|
Joint
|
04/24/2023
|
Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP
|
|
|
Joint
|
04/10/2023
|
Voted: Divided Report
|
|
|
Joint
|
04/10/2023
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed.
|
|
|