Senate | 06/06/2023 | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. | ||
House | 06/01/2023 | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | ||
House | 06/01/2023 | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | Ordered sent down forthwith | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. | ||
Senate | 05/30/2023 | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | READ ONCE | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | ||
Joint | 05/18/2023 | Reported Out: OTP | ||
Joint | 04/26/2023 | Voted: OTP | ||
Joint | 04/26/2023 | Work Session Held | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |