House
|
05/10/2024
|
Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2024
|
ROLL CALL NO. 554V 53 having voted in the affirmative and 67 in the negative, with 29 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2024
|
This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-934) in concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-934) READ and ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
READ ONCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 679 Yeas 21 - Nays 12 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
On motion by Senator TIPPING of Penobscot The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Reports READ
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-934).
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-934) was READ and ADOPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
The Bill was READ ONCE.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
ROLL CALL NO. 478 (Yeas 74 - Nays 66 - Absent 10 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1)
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
On motion of Representative ROEDER of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Reports READ.
|
|
|
Joint
|
04/08/2024
|
Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP
|
|
|
Joint
|
03/28/2024
|
Voted: Divided Report
|
|
|
Joint
|
03/28/2024
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
House
|
07/26/2023
|
Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847.
|
|
|
Joint
|
07/25/2023
|
Carry Over Approved
|
|
|
Joint
|
06/01/2023
|
Carry Over Requested
|
|
|
Joint
|
06/01/2023
|
Work Session Held: TABLED
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING in concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Committee on Labor and Housing suggested and ordered printed.
|
|
|