House | 04/27/2023 | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | ROLL CALL NO. 43 (Yeas 79 - Nays 63 - Absent 8 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1) | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | On motion of Representative SUPICA of Bangor, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Reports READ. | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Sent down for concurrence | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | On motion by Senator HICKMAN of Kennebec the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Reports Read | ||
Joint | 04/21/2023 | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. | ||
Joint | 03/08/2023 | Voted: Divided Report | ||
Joint | 03/08/2023 | Work Session Held | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |