House | 06/07/2023 | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) | ||
House | 06/07/2023 | On motion of Representative BRENNAN of Portland, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. | ||
House | 06/07/2023 | Reports READ. | ||
House | 06/07/2023 | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | Sent down for concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | On motion by Senator RAFFERTY of York the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. | ||
Senate | 06/06/2023 | Reports Read | ||
Joint | 06/02/2023 | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM | ||
Joint | 05/24/2023 | Voted: Divided Report | ||
Joint | 05/23/2023 | Work Session Held | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |