Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
In accordance with the provisions of Section 21 of Article IX of the Constitution, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-559).
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (S-559) was READ and ADOPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
The Bill was READ ONCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
On motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Reports READ.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-559)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (S-559) READ and ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
READ ONCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Reports READ
|
|
|
Joint
|
03/06/2024
|
Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP
|
|
|
Joint
|
02/01/2024
|
Voted: Divided Report
|
|
|
Joint
|
02/01/2024
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/26/2023
|
CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847.
|
|
|
Joint
|
07/25/2023
|
Carry Over Approved
|
|
|
Joint
|
06/01/2023
|
Carry Over Requested
|
|
|
Joint
|
05/25/2023
|
Work Session Held: TABLED
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Committee on JUDICIARY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on JUDICIARY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
|
|
|