Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-115).
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
Committee Amendment "A" (S-115) was READ and ADOPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
The Bill was READ ONCE.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
On motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
Reports READ.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-115)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Committee Amendment "A" (S-115) READ and ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
READ ONCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland Report A Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-115) ACCEPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Taken from the table by the President
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Unfinished Business
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF ANY REPORT
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Reports READ
|
|
|
Joint
|
05/22/2023
|
Reported Out: OTP-AM/OTP-AM/OTP-AM/ONTP
|
|
|
Joint
|
05/04/2023
|
Work Session Reconsidered
|
|
|
Joint
|
05/04/2023
|
Voted: Divided Report
|
|
|
Joint
|
04/13/2023
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Committee on JUDICIARY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on JUDICIARY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
|
|
|