House
|
05/10/2024
|
Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2024
|
Unfinished Business
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Later today assigned.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
On motion of Representative MEYER of Eliot, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report.
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Reports READ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-641)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (S-641) READ and ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
READ ONCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 652 Yeas 22 - Nays 8 - Excused 5 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
On motion by Senator BALDACCI of Penobscot The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Reports READ
|
|
|
Joint
|
04/02/2024
|
Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM
|
|
|
Joint
|
03/14/2024
|
Voted: Divided Report
|
|
|
Joint
|
03/14/2024
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/26/2023
|
CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847.
|
|
|
Joint
|
07/25/2023
|
Carry Over Approved
|
|
|
Joint
|
06/01/2023
|
Carry Over Requested
|
|
|
Joint
|
05/18/2023
|
Work Session Held: TABLED
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence
|
|
|