Senate | 04/05/2023 | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. | ||
Joint | 03/24/2023 | Reported Out: ONTP | ||
Joint | 03/21/2023 | Voted: ONTP | ||
Joint | 03/21/2023 | Work Session Held | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY in concurrence | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY. | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology suggested and ordered printed. |