Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Ordered sent down forthwith.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-964), in concurrence.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-964) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
READ ONCE.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-964).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
|
|
|
Joint
|
04/11/2024
|
Reported Out: OTP-AM
|
|
|
Joint
|
02/07/2024
|
Voted: OTP-AM
|
|
|
Joint
|
02/07/2024
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
House
|
07/26/2023
|
Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847.
|
|
|
Joint
|
07/25/2023
|
Carry Over Approved
|
|
|
Joint
|
06/01/2023
|
Carry Over Requested
|
|
|
Joint
|
05/25/2023
|
Work Session Held: TABLED
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY.
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2023
|
Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed.
|
|
|