Senate
|
06/12/2023
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-363) in concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-363) READ and ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
READ ONCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
On motion by Senator LaFOUNTAIN of Kennebec the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Reports Read
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-363).
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-363) was READ and ADOPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
The Bill was READ ONCE.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
On motion of Representative LANDRY of Farmington, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Reports READ.
|
|
|
Joint
|
06/06/2023
|
Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP
|
|
|
Joint
|
05/15/2023
|
Voted: Divided Report
|
|
|
Joint
|
05/15/2023
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE in concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2023
|
Committee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife suggested and ordered printed.
|
|
|