Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Ordered sent down forthwith.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-170), in concurrence.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-170) READ and ADOPTED
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
READ ONCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-170).
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
|
|
|
Joint
|
05/17/2023
|
Reported Out: OTP-AM
|
|
|
Joint
|
04/07/2023
|
Voted: OTP-AM
|
|
|
Joint
|
04/07/2023
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS in concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Committee on Innovation, Development, Economic Advancement and Business suggested and ordered printed.
|
|
|