House
|
06/16/2023
|
Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2023
|
ROLL CALL NO. 253 (Yeas 73 - Nays 71 - Absent 6 - Excused 1)
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2023
|
The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to FAILED PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2023
|
ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2023
|
FAILED ENACTMENT
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2023
|
Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 350 Yeas 13 - Nays 22 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 FAILED
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2023
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2023
|
Sent down for concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 338 Yeas 21 - Nays 14 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
On motion by Senator STEWART of Aroostook The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED With The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-400) AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-400) in concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc moved The Senate INSIST To Accept The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-400).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 305 Yeas 23 - Nays 11 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
On motion by Senator BAILEY of York The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Reports READ
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-400).
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-400) was READ and ADOPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
The Bill was READ ONCE.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
Subsequently, on motion of Representative PERRY of Calais, the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
ROLL CALL NO. 182 (Yeas 67 - Nays 75 - Absent 8 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1)
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
Motion of Representative PERRY of Calais to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report FAILED.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
Reports READ.
|
|
|
Joint
|
06/08/2023
|
Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM
|
|
|
Joint
|
05/16/2023
|
Voted: Divided Report
|
|
|
Joint
|
05/16/2023
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
On motion by Senator Bailey of York, REFERRED to the Committee on Health Coverage, Insurance and Financial Services, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
On motion of Representative MEYER of Eliot, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed.
|
|
|