Senate | 04/18/2023 | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) | ||
Joint | 04/12/2023 | Reported Out: ONTP | ||
Joint | 04/11/2023 | Voted: ONTP | ||
Joint | 04/11/2023 | Work Session Held | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |