Senate | 03/20/2025 | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | FINALLY PASSED. | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Ordered sent down forthwith. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | READ ONCE | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | ||
Joint | 02/28/2025 | Reported Out: OTP | ||
Joint | 02/27/2025 | Voted: OTP | ||
Joint | 02/27/2025 | Work Session Held | ||
Senate | 01/14/2025 | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION in concurrence | ||
House | 01/14/2025 | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. | ||
House | 01/14/2025 | Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed. |