Senate | 03/20/2025 | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Ordered sent down forthwith. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-12), in concurrence. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Committee Amendment "A" (H-12) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | READ ONCE. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-12). | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | ||
Joint | 03/11/2025 | Reported Out: OTP-AM | ||
Joint | 03/06/2025 | Voted: OTP-AM | ||
Joint | 03/06/2025 | Work Session Held | ||
Senate | 01/28/2025 | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION in concurrence | ||
House | 01/28/2025 | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. | ||
House | 01/28/2025 | Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed. |