Senate
|
04/22/2025
|
On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT in concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
PASSED TO BE ENACTED.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
Ordered sent down forthwith.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-42), in concurrence.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
Committee Amendment "A" (H-42) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
READ ONCE.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2025
|
Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-42).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2025
|
Carried over, in the same posture, to the next special or regular session of the 132nd Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 519.
|
|
|
Joint
|
03/21/2025
|
Carry Over Approved
|
|
|
Joint
|
03/18/2025
|
Voted: OTP-AM
|
|
|
Joint
|
03/18/2025
|
Work Session Held
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2025
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY in concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2025
|
Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry suggested and ordered printed.
|
|
|