House
|
03/07/2023
|
Assigned Pa 4'23
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 03/07/2023 10:10 Am
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Approved By The Governor 03/07/2023 09:34 Am
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Presented To The Governor 03/01/2023 07:41 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Conference Report Adopted By Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Immediate Effect Defeated
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Immediate Effect Postponed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Vote Reconsidered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Senate Adopted Conference Report Roll Call # 22 Yeas 20 Nays 17 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Conference Report Received In Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Retransmitted
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Conference Report Adopted Roll Call # 13 Yeas 56 Nays 53 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Conference Report Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Senate Named Conferees 02/02/2023: Sens. Sam Singh, Sarah Anthony, Dan Lauwers
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Senate Named Conferees 02/01/2023: Sens. Sam Singh, Sarah Anthony, Dan Lauwers
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Referred To Conference Committee 02/01/2023
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Senate Conferees Named 02/01/2023: Sens. Sam Singh Sarah Anthony Dan Lauwers
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
House Conferees Named 02/01/2023: Reps. Samantha Steckloff Cynthia Neeley Greg Vanwoerkom
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Roll Call Roll Call # 12 Yeas 53 Nays 56 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Senate Substitute (s-2) Nonconcurred In
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-2) With Title Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
Title Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 16 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
Substitute (s-2) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Rule Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 5 Yeas 67 Nays 41 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2023
|
Placed On Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2023
|
Motion To Discharge Committee Approved
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/12/2023
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Tax Policy
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Angela Witwer
|
|
|