House
|
04/26/2023
|
Assigned Pa 23'23 With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 04/26/2023 01:11 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Approved By The Governor 04/26/2023 10:10 Am
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Presented To The Governor 04/20/2023 04:36 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 119 Yeas 36 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Title Amendment Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 31 Yeas 96 Nays 7 Excused 0 Not Voting 7
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Substitute (h-1) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 01/26/2023
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Kathy Schmaltz
|
|
|