House
|
05/09/2023
|
Assigned Pa 30'23 With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 05/08/2023 01:28 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Approved By The Governor 05/08/2023 11:38 Am
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Presented To The Governor 05/04/2023 09:34 Am
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Re-returned From Senate With Concurrence To House Amendment(s) To Senate Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Roll Call: Roll Call # 138 Yeas 32 Nays 5 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
House Amendment(s) To Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Returned From House With Amendment(s) To Senate Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Retransmitted
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Roll Call Roll Call # 64 Yeas 85 Nays 23 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In As Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Immediate Effect And Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 131 Yeas 33 Nays 4 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1) As Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Substitute (s-1) As Amended Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1) And Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 27 Yeas 80 Nays 23 Excused 0 Not Voting 7
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Substitute (h-1) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/01/2023
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Tax Policy
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Greg Vanwoerkom
|
|
|