House | 06/26/2024 | Postponed Temporarily | ||
House | 06/26/2024 | Vote On Passage Reconsidered | ||
House | 06/26/2024 | Rule Suspended | ||
House | 06/26/2024 | Returned As Requested | ||
Senate | 06/26/2024 | Return Granted | ||
Senate | 06/26/2024 | Placed On Order Of General Orders | ||
Senate | 06/26/2024 | Discharge Committee Approved | ||
Senate | 06/26/2024 | House Requests Return | ||
Senate | 06/27/2023 | Referred To Committee On Energy And Environment | ||
House | 06/22/2023 | Transmitted | ||
House | 06/22/2023 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 214 Yeas 56 Nays 53 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 | ||
House | 06/22/2023 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 06/21/2023 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 06/21/2023 | Substitute (h-1) Adopted And Amended | ||
House | 06/21/2023 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) | ||
House | 02/02/2023 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/02/2023 | ||
House | 02/02/2023 | Referred To Committee On Energy, Communications, And Technology | ||
House | 02/02/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 02/02/2023 | Introduced By Representative Kevin Coleman |