House
|
12/03/2024
|
Assigned Pa 158'24
|
|
|
House
|
12/03/2024
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 12/03/2024 01:12 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
12/03/2024
|
Approved By The Governor 12/03/2024 10:12 Am
|
|
|
House
|
11/26/2024
|
Presented To The Governor 11/20/2024 03:36 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2024
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2024
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2024
|
Roll Call Roll Call # 335 Yeas 56 Nays 53 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2024
|
Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Passed Roll Call # 48 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Amendment(s) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Amendment(s) Defeated
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Elections And Ethics
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 546 Yeas 56 Nays 53 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/22/2023
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Elections
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Stephanie Young
|
|
|