Senate | 04/26/2023 | Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Rules Suspended | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Transmitted | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 42 Yeas 61 Nays 47 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Substitute (h-2) Adopted | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Substitute (h-1) Adopted | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 02/28/2023 | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Referred To Committee On Judiciary | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Introduced By Representative Sharon Macdonell |