Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB4143 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 28, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 23, 2023
Bill March 8, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 18, 2023

Chaptered

Bill April 27, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis April 27, 2023