Senate | 12/18/2024 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-2) | ||
Senate | 12/18/2024 | Substitute (s-2) Concurred In | ||
Senate | 12/18/2024 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-2) | ||
Senate | 11/08/2023 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 11/08/2023 | Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-1) | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Referred To Committee On Health Policy | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Transmitted | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 41 Yeas 88 Nays 20 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Placed On Immediate Passage | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Substitute (h-3) Adopted | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-3) | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/02/2023 | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Introduced By Representative Jason Morgan |