House
|
12/31/2024
|
Returned From Senate Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
12/23/2024
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled 12/23/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/20/2024
|
Passed Roll Call # 666 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/18/2024
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/18/2024
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/26/2024
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/26/2024
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2024
|
Referred To Committee On Finance, Insurance, And Consumer Protection
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2024
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2024
|
Rep. Cameron Cavitt Removed As Cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2024
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 200 Yeas 56 Nays 53 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2024
|
Postponed Temporarily
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2024
|
Substitute (h-2) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2024
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2024
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2024
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
09/19/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
09/19/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/07/2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Government Operations
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Tyrone Carter
|
|
|