Senate | 02/29/2024 | Referred To Committee On Education | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Transmitted | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 17 Yeas 100 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 2 | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Substitute (h-1) Adopted | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/14/2023 | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Introduced By Representative Curtis Vanderwall |