House
|
06/08/2023
|
Referred To Conference Committee 06/08/2023
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Senate Conferees Named 06/08/2023: Sens. John Cherry Sue Shink Jon Bumstead
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Senate Named Conferees 06/08/2023: Sens. John Cherry, Sue Shink, Jon C. Bumstead
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
House Conferees Named 06/06/2023: Reps. Julie Brixie Jasper Martus Ken Borton
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Roll Call Roll Call # 133 Yeas 52 Nays 54 Excused 0 Not Voting 4
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Senate Substitute (s-1) Nonconcurred In
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 301 Yeas 20 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 85 Yeas 56 Nays 52 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Substitute (h-1) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/15/2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Julie Brixie
|
|
|