Senate | 06/27/2023 | Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety | ||
House | 06/21/2023 | Transmitted | ||
House | 06/21/2023 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 183 Yeas 104 Nays 5 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 | ||
House | 06/21/2023 | Amended | ||
House | 06/21/2023 | Amendment(s) Reconsidered | ||
House | 06/21/2023 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 06/20/2023 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 06/20/2023 | Substitute (h-2) Adopted | ||
House | 06/20/2023 | Substitute (h-1) Adopted | ||
House | 06/20/2023 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/16/2023 | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Referred To Committee On Judiciary | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Introduced By Representative Kara Hope |