House
|
09/19/2023
|
Assigned Pa 123'23 With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
House
|
09/19/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 09/19/2023 10:06 Am
|
|
|
House
|
09/19/2023
|
Approved By The Governor 09/18/2023 04:56 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
09/07/2023
|
Presented To The Governor 09/11/2023 11:22 Am
|
|
|
House
|
09/06/2023
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
09/06/2023
|
Roll Call Roll Call # 270 Yeas 101 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
|
|
|
House
|
09/06/2023
|
Senate Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-1) With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 394 Yeas 37 Nays 0 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Substitute (s-1) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 186 Yeas 104 Nays 5 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
Substitute (h-2) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
Substitute (h-1) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/16/2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Betsy Coffia
|
|
|