House
|
08/22/2023
|
Assigned Pa 109'23 With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
House
|
08/22/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 07/27/2023 09:50 Am
|
|
|
House
|
08/22/2023
|
Approved By The Governor 07/26/2023 12:02 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
07/18/2023
|
Presented To The Governor 07/17/2023 11:27 Am
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
06/28/2023
|
Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 419 Yeas 27 Nays 10 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Energy And Environment
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 221 Yeas 92 Nays 17 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 03/22/2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Tax Policy
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Cynthia Neeley
|
|
|