Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB4342 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 23, 2023

Engrossed

Bill October 5, 2023
Bill September 20, 2023

Enrolled

Bill October 6, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis October 31, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 20, 2023