House
|
10/10/2023
|
Assigned Pa 149'23 With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
House
|
10/10/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 10/10/2023 11:44 Am
|
|
|
House
|
10/10/2023
|
Approved By The Governor 10/10/2023 10:04 Am
|
|
|
House
|
10/10/2023
|
Presented To The Governor 10/09/2023 11:35 Am
|
|
|
House
|
10/03/2023
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
10/03/2023
|
Senate Amendment(s) Concurred In Roll Call # 331 Yeas 56 Nays 53 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
09/27/2023
|
Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
|
|
|
House
|
09/27/2023
|
Returned From Senate With Amendment(s) With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/27/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 473 Yeas 25 Nays 13 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/27/2023
|
Amendment(s) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/26/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/26/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/21/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/21/2023
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 226 Yeas 56 Nays 52 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Substitute (h-3) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
06/27/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Substitute (h-1) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/11/2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Transportation, Mobility And Infrastructure
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Sharon Macdonell
|
|
|