Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB4362 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 11, 2023

Engrossed

Bill June 27, 2023
Bill May 11, 2023

Enrolled

Bill July 6, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis September 20, 2023

Chaptered

Bill July 27, 2023