House
|
11/08/2023
|
Assigned Pa 181'23
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 11/07/2023 02:08 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Approved By The Governor 11/07/2023 01:00 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Presented To The Governor 10/26/2023 01:50 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled 10/20/2023
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/19/2023
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/19/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 557 Yeas 36 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/05/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/05/2023
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Finance, Insurance, And Consumer Protection
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 99 Yeas 83 Nays 24 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Substitute (h-1) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/11/2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Insurance And Financial Services
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Brenda Carter
|
|
|