Michigan 2023-2024 Regular Session

Michigan House Bill HB4418 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill April 13, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 7, 2024
Bill October 25, 2023

Enrolled

Bill February 20, 2024

Chaptered

Bill February 21, 2024