House
|
02/21/2024
|
Assigned Pa 4'24 With Immediate Effect
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 02/21/2024 11:00 Am
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Approved By The Governor 02/21/2024 09:32 Am
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Presented To The Governor 02/14/2024 09:28 Am
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Immediate Effect And Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 9 Yeas 38 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Reported Favorably Without Amendment
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/31/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 405 Yeas 109 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
10/25/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Substitute (h-1) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
10/24/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/13/2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Kelly Breen
|
|
|