Senate | 06/21/2023 | Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety | ||
House | 06/20/2023 | Transmitted | ||
House | 06/20/2023 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 174 Yeas 59 Nays 50 Excused 0 Not Voting 1 | ||
House | 06/20/2023 | Substitute (h-2) Adopted | ||
House | 06/20/2023 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | Substitute (h-1) Adopted | ||
House | 06/14/2023 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 06/13/2023 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 06/13/2023 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/26/2023 | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Introduced By Representative Kristian Grant |