House
|
12/31/2023
|
Assigned Pa 277'23
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Filed With Secretary Of State 12/08/2023 10:16 Am
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Approved By The Governor 12/07/2023 10:06 Am
|
|
|
House
|
12/31/2023
|
Presented To The Governor 11/27/2023 03:26 Pm
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Bill Ordered Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Full Title Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Roll Call Roll Call # 577 Yeas 89 Nays 18 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Senate Substitute (s-4) Concurred In
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Rule Suspended
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Laid Over One Day Under The Rules
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Returned From Senate With Substitute (s-4) With Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Inserted Full Title
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Passed Roll Call # 722 Yeas 24 Nays 13 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Substitute (s-4) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Amendment(s) Defeated
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Amendment(s) Withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Placed On Immediate Passage
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Placed On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute (s-3)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Substitute (s-3) Concurred In
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/09/2023
|
Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute (s-3)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Referred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute (s-3)
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/02/2023
|
Reported Favorably With Substitute (s-3)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
Transmitted
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 175 Yeas 83 Nays 26 Excused 0 Not Voting 1
|
|
|
House
|
06/20/2023
|
Read A Third Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Placed On Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Substitute (h-2) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Read A Second Time
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Referred To Second Reading
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-2)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Bill Electronically Reproduced 04/26/2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred To Committee On Criminal Justice
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Read A First Time
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Introduced By Representative Noah Arbit
|
|
|