Senate | 05/07/2024 | Referred To Committee On Health Policy | ||
House | 05/02/2024 | Transmitted | ||
House | 05/02/2024 | Rep. James Desana Removed As Cosponsor | ||
House | 05/02/2024 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 53 Yeas 97 Nays 7 Excused 0 Not Voting 6 | ||
House | 05/02/2024 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 04/24/2024 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 04/24/2024 | Substitute (h-1) Adopted | ||
House | 04/24/2024 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 10/12/2023 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 10/12/2023 | Reported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1) | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/04/2023 | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Introduced By Representative Dale Zorn |