House | 04/09/2024 | Assigned Pa 21'24 | ||
House | 04/09/2024 | Filed With Secretary Of State 03/28/2024 10:54 Am | ||
House | 04/09/2024 | Approved By The Governor 03/28/2024 09:48 Am | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Presented To The Governor 03/19/2024 11:34 Am | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Bill Ordered Enrolled | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Full Title Agreed To | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Returned From Senate Without Amendment With Full Title | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Inserted Full Title | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Passed Roll Call # 55 Yeas 21 Nays 17 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Placed On Order Of Third Reading | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Reported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably Without Amendment(s) | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Referred To Committee Of The Whole | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Reported Favorably Without Amendment | ||
Senate | 10/03/2023 | Referred To Committee On Transportation And Infrastructure | ||
House | 09/27/2023 | Transmitted | ||
House | 09/27/2023 | Passed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 316 Yeas 68 Nays 42 Excused 0 Not Voting 0 | ||
House | 09/27/2023 | Read A Third Time | ||
House | 09/26/2023 | Placed On Third Reading | ||
House | 09/26/2023 | Read A Second Time | ||
House | 09/19/2023 | Referred To Second Reading | ||
House | 09/19/2023 | Reported With Recommendation Without Amendment | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | Bill Electronically Reproduced 05/04/2023 | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Referred To Committee On Transportation, Mobility And Infrastructure | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Read A First Time | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Introduced By Representative Carrie Rheingans |